Financial history POOR ALLOTMENTS

Charity number: 211382
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.09k £2.30k £2.40k £2.35k £1.83k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £985 £760
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A