FREDERICK GEORGE DRAY, RESIDUARY ESTATE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity pays the income of the trust fund to four appointed charities in accordance with the governing documents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 November 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.21k | £26.68k | £43 | £29.28k | £51 | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.23k | £27.47k | £33 | £29.14k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED WITH TWO CODICILS AT LLANDUDNO, ON THE 10TH JANUARY 1942
Charitable objects
INCOME OF THE TRUST TO BE DIVIDED EQUALLY BETWEEN SPURGEON'S ORPHAN HOMES, BIRCHINGTON, KENT. DR. BARNARDO'S HOMES. WEST LONDON HOSPITAL HAMMERSMITH. LORD MAYOR TRELOAR'S CRIPPLES HOSPITAL AND COLLEGE, ALTON, HANTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
HSBC Trust Company (UK) Limited
Forum 1
2nd Floor
The Forum
Parkway
Whiteley
- Phone:
- 02380 722525
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window