WORTHING ANIMAL CLINIC

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of subsidised veterinary services to those of demonstrable limited means (i.e. those in receipt of means-tested benefits - Housing Benefit/Local Housing Allowance, Council Tax Benefit or Pension Credit - or formally recognised as homeless) whose pets might otherwise go untreated. Clients must also live in the Worthing-Lancing-Littlehampton area (BN11-BN17).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- West Sussex
Governance
- 07 November 1962: Standard registration
- WORTHING ANIMALS DISPENSARY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEOFFREY PARRISH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
KAROL JEFFERY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £235.86k | £138.94k | £179.58k | £160.27k | £202.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £212.64k | £171.01k | £181.76k | £183.54k | £196.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AS AMENDED 9TH SEPTEMBER 1975, 24 JUNE 1997, 30 AUGUST 2000, 19 MAY 2003 AND 25 JULY 2007
Charitable objects
RELIEVE THE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND PROTECTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, NEGLECT, EMERGENCY OR MALTREATMENT IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF VETERINARY CARE TO SUCH ANIMALS.
Area of benefit
WORTHING
Linked charities
- 07 November 1962 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
WORTHING ANIMAL CLINIC
ANTHONY HOUSE
30-32 NEWLAND ROAD
WORTHING
BN11 1JR
- Phone:
- 01903202248
- Email:
- info@worthinganimal.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window