SCAYNES HILL WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Monthly meeting with a variety of speakers - involvement in local village life & its activities. Craft classes held on a monthly basis and also a monthly lunch club, involving partners & friends.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2021
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- West Sussex
Governance
- 25 November 1969: Standard registration
- SCAYNES HILL WOMENS INSTITUTE (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alda Gerda Julia Edmond vanvoorden | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
FIONA O'LEARY | Trustee | 03 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.21k | £6.35k | £3.59k | £57 | £45 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.80k | £5.58k | £3.07k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 159 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 159 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 525 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 525 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 10 August 2022 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 22 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 13 August 2020 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES.INDENTURE DATED 17 FEBRUARY 1925 AND SCHEME OF 13 NOVEMBER 1973 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 6 AUGUST 1999
Charitable objects
The objects of the WI are to further the purposes of the Women’s Institute organisation
Area of benefit
SCAYNES HILL.
Linked charities
- 25 November 1969 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Beechcroft
Ham Lane
Scaynes Hill
HAYWARDS HEATH
RH17 7PS
- Phone:
- 01444831742
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window