Financial history THE GNC TRUST

Charity number: 211533
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £47.86k £39.96k £41.84k £41.68k £43.38k
Total expenditure £41.03k £56.58k £34.55k £41.86k £59.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A