THE GNC TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objective is to support general worthy causes and donations are made to charitable institutions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 October 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS I J WILLIAMSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS PJ RICHMOND-WATSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAYNE CADBURY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.86k | £39.96k | £41.84k | £41.68k | £43.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.03k | £56.58k | £34.55k | £41.86k | £59.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 February 2024 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 February 2024 | 93 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SETTLEMENT DATED 1ST NOVEMBER 1960
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE, SUBJECT TO THE APPROVAL DURING HIS LIFETIME OF THE SETTLOR.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Curo Chartered Accountants
Curo House
25 Greenbox
Westonhall Road
Stoke Prior
BROMSGRO
- Phone:
- 01527558539
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window