THE BRITISH GUILD OF TOURIST GUIDES BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve in cases of need, hardship and distress the following categories of persons: (a) Registered Tourist Guides having qualified for not less than one year; and, provided the Registered Guide has been qualified for not less than five years: (b) A spouse/partner (at the discretion of the Trustees) of a deceased Registered Guide; (c) Former or retired Registered Guides;
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 February 1963: Standard registration
- THE GUILD OF GUIDE LECTURERS BENEVOLENT FUND (Previous name)
- THE GUILD OF REGISTERED TOURIST GUIDES BENEVOLENT FUND (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TIMOTHY DAVID HUDSON | Chair | 28 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Hickey | Trustee | 23 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Barry Walsh | Trustee | 09 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
CAROLE MARIE CLAUDE HILEY | Trustee | 26 June 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.67k | £18.44k | £15.78k | £11.81k | £11.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.63k | £14.34k | £20.73k | £31.85k | £7.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 12 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 23 January 2024 | 177 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 12 August 2022 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
REVISED CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7TH FEBRUARY 1977 AMENDED 10TH JUNE, 15TH DECEMBER 1988 AND 8 DECEMBER 1995, AMENDED 5TH DECEMBER 2015
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE IN CASES OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS PERSONS IN THE CATEGORIES SPECIFIED IN RULE 2.3 OF THE CONSTITUTION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
201 Borough High Street
London
SE1 1JA
- Phone:
- 0207 403 1115
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window