Governing document HORTICULTURE RESEARCH INTERNATIONAL
Charity Number: 211581
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 24 JANUARY 1921 AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS DATED 30 SEPTEMBER 1987, 30 MARCH 1990, 19 SEPTEMBER 1990, 26 JUNE 1991, 14 JULY 1993 AND 31 MARCH 2004
Charitable objects
TO CARRY ON RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT WORK AND TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE IN CONNECTION WITH HORTICULTURE AND KINDRED INDUSTRIES INCLUDING FOREST TREES AND TO DISSEMINATE THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.