THE PHYSIOLOGICAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Society's main aims are to promote the advancement of physiology and to facilitate communication, both between scientists and with the wider public, through: the publication of scientific journals; support for scientific meetings; grants to allow physiologists to attend scientific meetings and develop research collaborations; and by supporting education and outreach activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£4,330,000
Donations and legacies | £3.00k | |
Charitable activities | £3.84m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £483.00k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£3,898,000
Raising funds | £48.00k | |
Charitable activities | £3.73m | |
Other | £120.00k |
-£20,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £168.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.73m | |
Retained for future use | £432.00k |
People

25 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
700 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£130k to £140k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- City Of Westminster
- Islington
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Annette Catherine Dolphin FRS | Chair | 02 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Fearon Clare Cassidy | Trustee | 29 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor David James Angus Wyllie | Trustee | 29 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard Peter Marshall | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nephtali Marina-Gonzalez | Trustee | 02 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Andrew John Parker | Trustee | 02 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Hugh Edward Montgomery | Trustee | 02 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Professor Paul McLoughlin | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Catherine Hall | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Michael Tipton | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Heidi de Wet | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Professor Aine Kelly | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.81m | £4.45m | £4.13m | £4.15m | £4.33m | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.69m | £3.59m | £3.80m | £4.02m | £3.90m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £11.00k | £3.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £4.41m | £4.09m | £3.80m | £3.80m | £3.84m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £397.00k | £365.00k | £326.00k | £342.00k | £483.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £5.50k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £4.47m | £3.39m | £3.62m | £3.96m | £3.73m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £32.00k | £22.00k | £31.00k | £53.00k | £48.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £180.00k | £146.00k | £200.00k | £273.00k | £950.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £36.00k | £3.00k | £3.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £32.00k | £22.00k | £31.00k | £53.00k | £48.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £191.00k | £179.00k | £153.00k | £0 | £120.00k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.05m | £1.93m | £1.81m | £1.75m | £1.44m | |
|
Long-term investments | £13.37m | £12.42m | £14.52m | £12.54m | £12.95m | |
|
Other assets | £4.18m | £6.25m | £5.31m | £4.75m | £5.03m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £3.92m | £4.11m | £3.85m | £3.27m | £3.27m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27/01/1937 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/03/1982 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/06/1985 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/07/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/12/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/07/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/07/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/03/2008 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 13/07/2011 as amended on 31 Jul 2016 as amended on 10 Dec 2019 as amended on 10 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE ADVANCEMENT OF PHYSIOLOGY AND TO FACILITATE THE INTERCOURSE OF PHYSIOLOGISTS, BOTH AT HOME AND ABROAD AND THEREBY CONTRIBUTE TO THE PROGRESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF BIO-MEDICAL AND RELATED SCIENCES AND THE DETECTION,PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF DISEASE, DISABILITY AND MALFUNCTION OF PHYSICAL PROCESSES IN ALL FORMS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Physiological Society
Hodgkin Huxley House
30 Farringdon Lane
LONDON
EC1R 3AW
- Phone:
- 02072695720
- Email:
- governance@physoc.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window