SHAKESPEARE MEMORIAL NATIONAL THEATRE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 31 August 1962: Standard registration
- 21 October 1996: Removed
- SHAKESPEARE MEMORIAL TRUST (Working name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED POLL DATED 20 MAY 1909. JUDGEMENT OF MR JUSTICE P O LAWRENCE DATED 29 JUNE 1925 AND SCHEME OF 10 JUNE 1964
Charitable objects
THE BUILDING OF A NATIONAL THEATRE AS A MEMORIAL TO SHAKESPEARE WITH THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS IN VIEW (1) TO KEEP THE PLAYS OF SHAKESPEARE IN ITS REPERTORY; (2) TO REVIVE WHATEVER ELSE IS VITAL IN ENGLISH CLASSICAL DRAMA; (3) TO PREVENT RECENT PLAYS OF GREAT MERIT FROM FALLING INTO THE OBLIVION INTO WHICH THE PRESENT THEATRICAL SYSTEM IS APT TO CONSIGN THEM; (4) TO PRODUCE NEW PLAYS AND TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE MODERN DRAMA; (5) TO PRODUCE TRANSLATIONS OF REPRESENTATIVE WORKS OF FOREIGN DRAMA, ANCIENT AND MODERN; (6) TO STIMULATE THE ART OF ACTING THROUGH THE VARIED OPPORTUNITIES WHICH IT WILL OFFER TO THE MEMBERS OF ITS COMPANY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 31 August 1962 : Standard registration
- 21 October 1996 : Removed
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.