SIR BARRY JACKSON TRUST

Charity Number: 211619
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Sir Barry Jackson Trust,s objects and principal activities are to fund the advancement and improvement of education in drama and theatrical production and to develop the public,s appreciation of such art.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £12,392
Total expenditure: £12,156

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City
  • Coventry City
  • Dudley
  • Sandwell
  • Solihull
  • Staffordshire
  • Walsall
  • Warwickshire
  • Wolverhampton
  • Worcestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 November 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DEBORAH MARY SHAW Chair 27 October 2009
THE SIR BARRY JACKSON COUNTY FUND
Received: On time
Councillor Kerry Shaunna Jenkins Trustee 01 July 2024
None on record
Davinder Dosanjh Trustee 25 January 2024
THE BENEVOLENT FUND OF HER MAJESTY'S INSPECTORS OF SCHOOLS IN ENGLAND AND WALES
Received: On time
THE SIR BARRY JACKSON COUNTY FUND
Received: On time
EDUCATIONAL OPPORTUNITY FOUNDATION
Received: On time
CARNETTE VENETTA RICHARDSON-JACQUET Trustee 25 January 2024
THE DANCEXCHANGE LIMITED
Received: On time
Naylah Ahmed Trustee 25 January 2024
THE SIR BARRY JACKSON COUNTY FUND
Received: On time
Dr Steven Derrick Ball Trustee 25 January 2024
THE SIR BARRY JACKSON COUNTY FUND
Received: On time
Hugh Sergio Blackwood Trustee 25 January 2024
THE SIR BARRY JACKSON COUNTY FUND
Received: On time
STAN'S CAFE THEATRE
Received: On time
Edmund Peter Collier Trustee 25 January 2024
THE SIR BARRY JACKSON COUNTY FUND
Received: On time
BLINK DANCE THEATRE CIO
Recently registered
Professor Mark Alan Evans Trustee 25 January 2024
THE SIR BARRY JACKSON COUNTY FUND
Received: On time
Neil Paul Reading Trustee 25 January 2024
THE SIR BARRY JACKSON COUNTY FUND
Received: On time
Stuart James Rogers Trustee 19 October 2023
THE SIR BARRY JACKSON COUNTY FUND
Received: On time
Amelia Rose Ladbrook Trustee 10 June 2019
THE SIR BARRY JACKSON COUNTY FUND
Received: On time
GRAHAM JAMES SAUNDERS Trustee 20 October 2016
THE SIR BARRY JACKSON COUNTY FUND
Received: On time
LINDA MORGAN Trustee 12 January 2015
THE SIR BARRY JACKSON COUNTY FUND
Received: On time
PROFESSOR CLAIRE ELIZABETH COCHRANE Trustee 05 November 2013
THE SIR BARRY JACKSON COUNTY FUND
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £9.69k £9.80k £10.27k £11.23k £12.39k
Total expenditure £2.67k £4.40k £4.98k £2.28k £12.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 27 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 12 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 13 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 24 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 23 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
C/O B'HAM REPERTORY THEATRE LTD
CENTENARY SQUARE
BROAD STREET
BIRMINGHAM
B1 2EP
Phone:
0121 2452000
Website:

No information available