Financial history MARAN - ATHA TRUST

Charity number: 211641
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £13.16k £11.79k £15.89k £20.96k £20.18k
Total expenditure £30.19k £29.64k £28.59k £32.91k £39.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A