FRIENDS WORLD COMMITTEE FOR CONSULTATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides services to the Religious Society of Friends [Quakers] worldwide. These services include: making information available to Friends and to the public about Quakers, their beliefs, values and service activities; convening meetings and conferences and exchanges of visitors among Friends; providing the voice of Friends at the United Nations through our General Consultative Status.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Austria
- Belarus
- Belgium
- Belize
- Bolivia
- Botswana
- Burundi
- Cambodia
- Canada
- Congo
- Costa Rica
- Croatia
- Cuba
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- El Salvador
- Finland
- France
- Georgia
- Germany
- Ghana
- Greece
- Guatemala
- Haiti
- Honduras
- Hong Kong
- Hungary
- Iceland
- India
- Ireland
- Italy
- Jamaica
- Japan
- Kenya
- Latvia
- Lebanon
- Lesotho
- Luxembourg
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Mexico
- Nepal
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Nicaragua
- Nigeria
- Northern Ireland
- Norway
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- Peru
- Philippines
- Poland
- Russia
- Rwanda
- Scotland
- Serbia
- Sierra Leone
- Singapore
- Slovakia
- Slovenia
- South Africa
- South Korea
- Spain
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Tanzania
- Uganda
- Ukraine
- United States
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 17 January 1963: Standard registration
- FWCC (Working name)
- FWCC WORLD OFFICE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Esther Mombo | Chair | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nelson Medardo Ayala Amaya | Trustee | 01 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Wycliffe Kibisu Majengo | Trustee | 12 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Evan Stryker Welkin | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Marjorie Angalot | Trustee | 08 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kenya Caridad Casanova-Sales | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Gee | Trustee | 11 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN PENNARD GLAMORGAN | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Christopher Fletcher | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Ullathorne | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Caroline Ethel Livermore | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL ECCLES | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Thuli Mbete | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Bainito Wamalwa | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £260.54k | £269.17k | £186.60k | £224.93k | £374.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £231.16k | £233.22k | £220.85k | £228.03k | £284.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.19k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MINUTE OF A CONFERENCE OF MEMBERS OF THE RELIGIOUS SOCIETY OF FRIENDS HELD AT OXFORD IN 1952, AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 5 NOV 2003, RESOLUTION DATED 17 JAN 2004, SCHEME DATED 2 APR 2004 AND RESOLUTION 11 AUGUST 2007.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, BY MEANS OF FOSTERING THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICE OF THE RELIGIOUS SOCIETY OF FRIENDS (QUAKERS) WORLDWIDE THROUGH CONSULTATION AND CO-OPERATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
173 EUSTON ROAD
LONDON
NW1 2AX
- Phone:
- 02076631199
- Email:
- world@friendsworldoffice.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window