Linked charities EDWARD TERRILL
Charity number: 211668

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Linked charities
Governing document
INDENTURE DATED 23 OCTOBER 1745 AND SCHEMES OF 24 DECEMBER 1869 AND 22 JANUARY 1907 AS AMENDED 9/1/97 BY RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER SECTION 75 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993
Charitable objects
INCOME TO BE APPLIED TOWARDS STIPEND OF PARSON OF THE BROADMEAD CHAPEL
Area of benefit
BRISTOL
Registration history
- 19 October 1962 : Standard registration
- 06 November 1997 : Removed
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.