CRANLEIGH LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 211696
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Distribution of funds collected from Brethren of the Lodge to Masonic and local charities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £3,635
Total expenditure: £2,709

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 October 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John William Henry Southgate Trustee 09 October 2019
None on record
Christopher Edward Betts Trustee 09 October 2019
None on record
CHRISTOPHER FREDERICK KENDALL Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £5.90k £6.62k £5.36k £6.25k £3.64k
Total expenditure £7.33k £6.77k £0 £11.28k £2.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 03 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 11 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 09 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 29 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 27 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 27 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
28 Chestnut Way
GODALMING
Surrey
GU7 1TS
Phone:
07710987546