THE LONDON HEALING MISSION
Charity number: 211713
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
No information available
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
No information available
Governance
Registration history:
- 17 October 1962: Standard registration
- 02 July 2002: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 02 July 2002: Funds transferred to 1080534 THE CHRISTIAN HEALING MISSION
Organisation type:
Other names:
- C H M (Working name)
- THE CHRISTIAN HEALING MISSION (Previous name)
- THE LONDON HEALING MISSION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
No accounts and annual returns information is available for this removed charity
Governing document
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17 JULY 1950 AS AMENDED 5 JANUARY 1984, 2 MARCH 1994 AND 22 AUGUST 1994
Charitable objects
PROMOTION OF THE DIVINE HEALING MINISTRY
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.