Accounts and annual returns THE FIFTH POLISH KRESOWA INFANTRY DIVISION WIDOWS ORPHANS AND INVALIDS RELIEF FUND

Charity number: 211768
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2012 13 February 2013 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2011 13 February 2013 379 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2010 23 June 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 23 June 2010 On Time