E S G ROBINSON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trustees apply the charity's funds in the fields of numismatics, culture and the arts, the environment and sustainability. Donations are made primarily to other registered charities. Unsolicited applications are not requested, as the Trustees make donations to charities whose work they have come across through their own research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 28 November 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexandra Clare Robinson | Trustee | 24 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Helen Loewendahl | Trustee | 27 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Felix Oliver Horsley Cox | Trustee | 30 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Seymour Robinson | Trustee | 30 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
William Alexander BALSTON | Trustee | 27 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Charlotte Atalanta Horsley ROCK | Trustee | 02 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63.95k | £25.52k | £65.65k | £42.23k | £50.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.17k | £29.25k | £38.95k | £39.24k | £45.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10TH AUGUST 1956
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Stockwell Park Road
LONDON
SW9 0AP
- Phone:
- 02077350434
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window