RADIOS FOR BLIND PEOPLE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
provided radio equipment to Registered Blind or Partially sighted people resident in the UK, over the age of 8 and in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 November 1962: Standard registration
- 10 November 1997: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- BWBF (Working name)
- WIRELESS FOR THE BLIND (Working name)
- WIRELESS FUND (Working name)
- BRITISH WIRELESS FOR THE BLIND FUND (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2004 | 31/10/2005 | 31/10/2006 | 31/10/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.73k | £2.44k | £2.18k | £2.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £2.44k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2008 | 24 August 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2007 | 15 September 2008 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2006 | 21 August 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2005 | 20 September 2006 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2004 | 22 August 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 OCTOBER 1952 AS AMENDED 7 APRIL 1992
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF REGISTERED BLIND OR REGISTERED PARTIALLY SIGHTED PEOPLE IN THE BRITISH ISLES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF RADIOS RADIO CASSETTE RECORDERS TELEVISION SOUND RECEIVERS AND ANY OTHER EQUIPMENT OR SERVICES NECESSARY TO ALLOW THEM TO BENEFIT FROM THE RECEPTION OF SOUND TRANSMISSION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 19 November 1962 : Standard registration
- 10 November 1997 : Removed
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window