FREEMANTLE HALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village Hall letting for the community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bexley
Governance
- 18 April 1963: Standard registration
- THE FREEMANTLE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keith Andrews | Trustee | 27 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Ross | Trustee | 27 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
CLLR ALAN DOWNING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALLAN JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SALLY MATKINS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.33k | £14.34k | £36.28k | £33.37k | £24.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.33k | £5.59k | £22.64k | £30.55k | £24.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £19.49k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 18 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 02 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 02 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF CONVEYANCE 14TH MARCH, 1891 (U.V.232 P.357).
Charitable objects
TO MANAGE AND MAINTAIN THE "FREEMANTLE HALL" FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BEXLEY,
Area of benefit
BEXLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
158 Howard Avenue
BEXLEY
DA5 3AX
- Phone:
- 07376291736
- Website:
-
Freemantlehall.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window