CAMPAIGN TO PROTECT RURAL ENGLAND - DORSET BRANCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Branch shall be seek to improve, protect and preserve for the benefit of the public, the countryside and the market towns and rural villages of the County of Dorset.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
31 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Dorset
Governance
- 24 October 1963: Standard registration
- 04 May 2021: Funds received from 264546 SHAFTESBURY CIVIC SOCIETY
- DORSET BRANCH CPRE (Working name)
- COUNCIL FOR THE PRESERVATION OF RURAL ENGLAND (DORSET BRANCH) (Previous name)
- THE COUNCIL FOR THE PROTECTION OF RURAL ENGLAND (COUNTY OF DORSET BRANCH) (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Matthews | Chair | 20 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Theodore Terence Rottenburg | Trustee | 16 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA DOBNEY BROWN | Trustee | 16 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Michael Hughes | Trustee | 19 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Robert John Bowmer | Trustee | 19 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr FRANCES HOGWOOD | Trustee | 20 November 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £530.34k | £93.18k | £41.09k | £45.65k | £48.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.28k | £59.79k | £49.50k | £55.32k | £71.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £518.98k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £3.89k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £7.47k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £497.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £35.38k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £26.90k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 17 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 17 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED (WITH AMENDMENTS) ON 28TH OCTOBER 1972 AS AMENDED 18 NOVEMBER 1996 AS AMENDED ON 22 NOV 2008 as amended on 21 Nov 2015
Charitable objects
TO IMPROVE, PROTECT AND PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE COUNTRYSIDE AND THE COUNTRY TOWNS AND VILLGES OF THE COUNTY OF DORSET. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF CONSTITUTION)
Area of benefit
DORSET
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO Box 9018
Dorchester
Dorset
DT1 9GY
- Phone:
- 0333 577 0360
- Email:
- info@dorset-cpre.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window