THE COLMAN ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity number: 211992
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Maintenance of 6 Almshouse Cottages

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £20,301
Total expenditure: £6,322

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 November 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Alison Clare Pooley Chair 15 May 2019
EDWARD COLMAN'S EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
CHARITY KNOWN AS POORS LAND AND POORS HOUSES (OR GILBERTS CHARITY)
Received: On time
Neil Eamonn Murphy Trustee 17 October 2024
CHARITY KNOWN AS POORS LAND AND POORS HOUSES (OR GILBERTS CHARITY)
Received: On time
EDWARD COLMAN'S EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
William Donald Townrow Trustee 01 May 2024
CHARITY KNOWN AS POORS LAND AND POORS HOUSES (OR GILBERTS CHARITY)
Received: On time
EDWARD COLMAN'S EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
Christopher Helms Trustee 13 April 2022
EDWARD COLMAN'S EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
Karen Elizabeth Marshall Trustee 03 February 2021
CHARITY KNOWN AS POORS LAND AND POORS HOUSES (OR GILBERTS CHARITY)
Received: On time
EDWARD COLMAN'S EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
Rev Herbert Michael Birt Trustee 03 August 2020
CHARITY KNOWN AS POORS LAND AND POORS HOUSES (OR GILBERTS CHARITY)
Received: On time
EDWARD COLMAN'S EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
CHELSWORTH PAROCHIAL CHARITY
Received: On time
James Anthony Davis Trustee 17 June 2014
EDWARD COLMAN'S EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
CHARITY KNOWN AS POORS LAND AND POORS HOUSES (OR GILBERTS CHARITY)
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £16.56k £16.47k £14.71k £17.68k £20.30k
Total expenditure £14.86k £4.94k £19.89k £18.24k £6.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 03 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 13 March 2023 133 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 January 2021 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
60 Rectory Road
IPSWICH
IP2 8EQ
Phone:
07968221446
Website:

No information available