Governing document BUILDERS' BENEVOLENT INSTITUTION
Charity number: 212022

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ESTABLISHED 1848. RULES ADOPTED 8 MARCH 1972 AS AMENDED 7 MARCH 1973, 26 MARCH 1975, 19 JULY 1995 AND 19 JULY 2006 as amended on 17 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
THE ASSISTANCE OF (I) PERSONS IN NEED WHO HAVE BEEN (OR WHO ARE) ENGAGED IN THE BUILDING TRADE AS MASTER BUILDERS (II) THE WIVES, WIDOWS AND CHILDREN OF ANY SUCH PERSONS BEING IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.