DR FRIER'S CHILDREN'S HOLIDAY FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDE HOLIDAYS FOR DISADVANTAGED CHILDREN WHO LIVE IN THE GRANTHAM AREA
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Leicestershire
- Lincolnshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 26 November 1962: Standard registration
- DR FRIER (CHILDREN'S HOLIDAY) MEMORIAL FUND (Working name)
- THE DR FRIER MEMORIAL FUND FOR CRIPPLED AND INVALID CHILDREN (Previous name)
- THE DR FRIER MEMORIAL FUND FOR CRIPPLED AND INVALID CHILDREN (ALSO KNOWN INFORMALLY AS DR FRIER (CHILDREN'S HOLIDAY) MEMORIAL FUND)" (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KAREN BRADFORD | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Andrew Gregory | Trustee |
|
||||||
CHERILYN DEWEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.29k | £4.48k | £8.06k | £5.56k | £5.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.41k | £918 | £8.48k | £12.46k | £8.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 February 2025 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 July 2024 | 167 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 March 2022 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 31ST DECEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
1. TO MAKE FINANCIAL PROVISION TO HELP THE CONTIMUANCE OF THE ANNUAL SEASIDE HOLIDAYS OFR CRIPPLED AND INVALID CHILDREN STARTED BY THE LATE DR. CHARLES MATTHEW FRIER. 2. IF FOR ANY REASON THE TRUST CANNOT BE EXECUTED TO MAY THE IMCOME OF THE FUND TO THE NATIONAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO CHILDREN OR SUCH OTHER CHARITY FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHILDREN AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
GRANTHAM AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 HARROWBY LANE
GRANTHAM
NG31 9HX
- Phone:
- 01476565840
- Email:
- gregoryand1@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window