MHG STAFF BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Making grants, payments, gratuities pensions or allowances to or for the benefit of persons who shall be or shall have been in the employment of the Maybourne Group, or wives, widows, husbands, widowers, children, parents or other dependants of such persons. No grant shall be made or paid to or for the benefit of any person unless they are in need of the financial assistance so afforded.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 November 1962: Standard registration
- SAVOY COMPANY STAFF BENEVOLENT FUND (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRZEGORZ JAN MAZUREK | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Marc Socker Mr | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sean Nicholas Kerrin | Trustee | 21 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.22k | £7.08k | £6.34k | £9.30k | £10.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.94k | £5.20k | £5.69k | £5.51k | £5.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 01 August 2024 | 178 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 08 March 2023 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 14 March 2022 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 17 March 2021 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 4TH DECEMBER, 1953.
Charitable objects
MAKING GRANTS, PAYMENTS, GRATUITIES PENSIONS OR ALLOWANCES TO OR FOR BENEFIT OF PERSONS WHO SHALL BE OR SHALL HAVE BEEN IN THE EMPLOYMENT OF THE SAVOY HOTEL LTD, OR WIVES WIDOWS HUSBANDS WIDOWERS CHILDREN PARENTS OR OTHER DEPENDANTS OF SUCH PERSONS. NO GRANT SHALL BE MADE OR PAID TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF ANY PERSON UNLESS THEY ARE IN NEED OF THE FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE SO AFFORDED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Maybourne Hotel Group
4th Floor
27 Knightsbridge
London
SW1X 7LY
- Phone:
- 02071078920
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window