Trustees ST HILDA'S EAST

Charity number: 212208
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Susan Jill Cattermole Trustee 26 March 2025
None on record
Catarina Alves Macedo de Sousa Trustee 26 March 2025
None on record
Reiko Marie Barrett Trustee 18 May 2024
None on record
Paola Santa Cruz de Jackson Trustee 27 September 2023
None on record
Amarr Wright Trustee 27 September 2023
None on record
Courtney Cesari Trustee 27 September 2023
None on record
Nafis Kibriya Trustee 27 September 2023
None on record
Kate Simpson Trustee 01 June 2021
None on record
Malini McCauley Trustee 05 July 2018
None on record
JEAN LOCKER Trustee
FRIENDS OF ARNOLD CIRCUS
Received: On time