PEAK AND NORTHERN FOOTPATHS SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Monitoring, supporting, and opposing proposals and orders for the creation, closure, diversion and regrading of public rights of way. Erecting and maintaining direction posts , signs, footbridges and commemorative structures. All objects conducive to the forgoing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 28 February 1963: Standard registration
- PEAK DISTRICT AND NORTHERN COUNTIES FOOTPATHS PRESERVATION SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Charles Brown | Trustee | 07 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tim Lewis | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chad Moses Wilkinson | Trustee | 27 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Katherine McLean | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Gosling | Trustee | 30 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mel Bale | Trustee | 30 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
PAUL EASTHOPE | Trustee | 07 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID CHARLES MORTON | Trustee | 07 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.04k | £76.00k | £74.88k | £198.14k | £47.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.97k | £64.51k | £47.78k | £244.53k | £74.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION OF RULES, AS AMENDED 26/04/1984, 23/04/1987, 16/04/1991, 15/04/1993, 06/04/1995, 27 /04/2002 , 26/04/2003 AND 27/04/2013 AS AMENDED ON 14 APR 2018
Charitable objects
CREATING, PRESERVING AND IMPROVING OPEN SPACES, PUBLIC ACCESS RIGHTS AND RIGHTS OF WAY (OTHER THAN FOR MECHANICALLY PROPELLED VEHICLES); PARTICULARLY IN CHESHIRE, DERBYSHIRE, LANCASHIRE AND STAFFORDSHIRE, THE FORMER METROPOLITAN COUNTIES OF GREATER MANCHESTER, MERSEYSIDE, SOUTH AND WEST YORKSHIRE AND IN BLACKBURN & DARWEN, BLACKPOOL, DERBY, HALTON, STOKE-ON-TRENT AND WARRINGTON. B) PREVENTING THE ABUSE OF SUCH RIGHTS. C) MONITORING, SUPPORTING AND OPPOSING PROPOSALS AND ORDERS FOR THE CREATION, CLOSURE, DIVERSION AND REGRADING OF PUBLIC RIGHTS OF WAY. D) ERECTING AND MAINTAINING DIRECTION POSTS, SIGNS, FOOTBRIDGES AND COMMEMORATIVE AND OTHER STRUCTURES WHICH IMPROVE ACCESS. E) ALL OBJECTS CONDUCIVE TO THE FOREGOING.
Area of benefit
SEE ABOVE
Contact information
- Address:
-
TAYLOR HOUSE
23 TURNCROFT LANE
OFFERTON
STOCKPORT
SK1 4AB
- Phone:
- 0161 480 3565
- Email:
- mail@pnfs.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window