SUDBURY COMMON LANDS CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ACCESS AND CONSERVATION MANAGEMENT OF THE SUDBURY RIVERSIDE, PLUS PROVISION OF BUILDING IN SUDBURY TOWN CENTRE AS AN OPERATIONAL BASE FOR CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £48,746 from 3 government contract(s) and £12,620 from 1 government grant(s)
People

16 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 08 November 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NIGEL ROBERT ELEY | Chair | 25 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Ogle | Trustee | 07 May 2025 |
|
|||||
FIONA MARGARET WHEELER | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|||||
William Roger Ford | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Anna Louise Elizabeth Brown | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Hunt | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
David William Dale | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Peter Leonard Fulcher | Trustee | 25 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Michael Edward John Wheeler | Trustee | 05 November 2014 |
|
|||||
Samantha Jane Hobson | Trustee | 26 February 2014 |
|
|||||
RICHARD WILLIAM KEMSLEY | Trustee | 25 July 2012 |
|
|||||
ROSS EDWARD BENTLEY | Trustee | 23 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
KEITH ROBINS | Trustee | 06 June 2011 |
|
|||||
REVEREND RICHARD KIMBER TITFORD | Trustee |
|
||||||
PETER WHITELEY | Trustee |
|
||||||
MARK JAMES GEDDES | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £143.65k | £122.37k | £341.15k | £141.80k | £165.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £133.51k | £121.33k | £138.34k | £157.38k | £174.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £41.07k | £43.67k | £44.05k | £47.41k | £48.75k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £12.62k | £12.62k | £12.62k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 20 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 20 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 14TH MAY 1987
Charitable objects
(A) RELIEVING IN CASES OF OLD AGE, SICKNESS OR FINANCIAL NEED FREEMAN AND THE WIDOWS OR WIDOWERS OF FREEMAN; (B) MAKING PAYMENTS TO THE TRUSTEES OF THE CHARITY CALLED THE SUDBURY FREEMAN'S TRUST; (C) PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE TOWN OF SUDBURY WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (D) MAKING PAYMENTS TO THE TRUSTEES F THE SUDBURY MUNICIPAL CHARITIES; (E) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OR THE NEEDY INHABITANTS OF THE TOWN OF SUDBURY.(FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE SCHEME)
Area of benefit
TOWN OF SUDBURY
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Christopher Centre
10 Gainsborough Street
Sudbury
Suffolk
CO10 2EU
- Phone:
- 07905 957608
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window