ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES

Charity number: 212296
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide and maintain accomodation for almshouse and other tenants and appointees

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £71,980
Total expenditure: £42,771

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 January 1969: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PHILIP BARLOW Chair 14 November 2012
MISS KING'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Charity reporting is overdue by 575 days
Rev Jonathan Llewelyn Pritchard Trustee 15 June 2023
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WITHAM
Received: On time
Sandra Howell Trustee 16 February 2021
None on record
Rodney Cullum Trustee 03 December 2020
None on record
Sue Wilson Trustee 11 June 2015
E.W.KING ELDERLY POOR, SICK & BLIND FUND
Received: On time
THE COGGESHALL COMMUNITY SPORTS ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
MISS KING'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Charity reporting is overdue by 575 days
PATRICIA CHAPMAN Trustee
MISS KING'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Charity reporting is overdue by 575 days

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £67.76k £70.32k £75.13k £68.33k £71.98k
Total expenditure £39.49k £34.20k £63.14k £61.45k £42.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEMES OF 24 MAY 1929 AND 28 NOVEMBER 1968
Charitable objects
FOR THE PROVISION OF ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR PERSONS OF GOOD CHARACTER, AND THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF ALMS PEOPLE
Area of benefit
WITHAM
Registration history
  • 07 January 1969 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
27 Acacia Drive
MALDON
CM9 6AW
Phone:
07930583802
Website:

No information available