Accounts and annual returns CHARITIES FOR THE POOR

Charity number: 212301
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2008 27 July 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2007 05 February 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required