THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND EVANGELICAL COUNCIL
Charity number: 212315
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
- Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
Registration history:
- 18 December 1969: Standard registration
- 17 August 2004: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 17 August 2004: Funds transferred to 1104514 THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND EVANGELICAL COUNCIL
Organisation type:
Other names:
- ANGLICAN EVANGELICAL ASSEMBLY (AEA) (Working name)
- C E E C (Working name)
- NATIONAL EVANGELICAL ANGLICAN CONGRESS (NEAC) (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 07 December 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 07 December 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION REVISED ON THE 5TH JUNE 1969, AND AMENDED DATED 30 APRIL 1993
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
UNRESTRICTED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window