NORTHCHAPEL, PETWORTH AND TILLINGTON ALMSHOUSES

Charity Number: 212320
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Residential Almshouses in Petworth Town

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024

Total income: £78,352
Total expenditure: £58,774

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • West Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 September 1979: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THOMPSON'S HOSPITAL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Homes England
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN CAMPBELL MORGAN RIDDELL Trustee 08 November 2024
R G RIDDELL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE EGREMONT AND SOMERSET ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
Rev David Crook Dr Trustee 27 January 2021
None on record
Canon Mark Gilbert Trustee 27 November 2015
PETWORTH AND DISTRICT OVER 60'S DAY CENTRE
Received: On time
THE EGREMONT AND SOMERSET ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
ANDREW WILLIAM BROOKE Trustee 31 May 2013
THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S PETWORTH
Received: On time
PETWORTH COTTAGE NURSING HOME
Received: On time
LORD JOHN MAX HENRY SCAWEN EGREMONT Trustee 23 July 2012
THE EGREMONT AND SOMERSET ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
SHIRLEY BINGHAM BARING-JOHNSTONE Trustee 02 September 2011
None on record
NONA CATHARINE BAKER Trustee
MISS P M MAJOR CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT
Received: On time
Andrew Charles Howard Trustee
THE PETWORTH COTTAGE TRUST
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY THE VIRGIN, PETWORTH
Received: On time
JANET ELIZABETH DUNCTON Trustee
THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S PETWORTH
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £56.89k £55.09k £71.30k £77.17k £78.35k
Total expenditure £34.41k £54.54k £56.66k £48.47k £58.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 09 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 09 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2023 17 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 17 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 29 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 29 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 27 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 27 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 29 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 29 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Leconfield Estates
Estate Office
Park Road
PETWORTH
West Sussex
Phone:
01798342502
Website:

No information available