Trustees RUISLIP COMBINED CHARITY
Charity number: 212349

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Garelick | Chair | 11 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rabbi Stanley Coten | Trustee | 09 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cllr. Peter William Smallwood | Trustee | 15 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Riley MBE | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tony Eginton | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.