THE EAST HAM CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Sir Jacob Garrard Charity is for the benefit of persons under 25 years; resident in the ancient parish of East Ham who are in need of financial assistance (The ancient parish of East Ham broadly covers the wards of Beckton, East Ham, Manor Park and Little Ilford).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Newham
Governance
- 03 November 1962: Standard registration
- 18 February 2009: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 18 February 2009: Funds transferred to 208350-1 THE MAYOR OF NEWHAM TRUST RELIEF BRANCH
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £94 | £99 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 04 January 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 04 January 2008 | 338 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE COMMISSION DATED 8 AUGUST 1978
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF EAST HAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window