THE AUTHORS' CONTINGENCY FUND

Charity number: 212406
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provides emergency financial help to authors

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £93,528
Total expenditure: £423,728

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 January 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
The Society of Authors Trustee 16 January 1963
FRANCIS HEAD AWARD
Received: On time
THE TOM GALLON TRUST
Received: On time
THE SOMERSET MAUGHAM TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE BETTY TRASK FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE K BLUNDELL TRUST
Received: On time
THE ARTHUR WELTON FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE T E M MCKITTERICK TRUST
Received: On time
THE TRAVELLING SCHOLARSHIP FUND OF THE INCORPORATED SOCIETY OF AUTHORS,PLAYWRIGHTS AND COMPOSERS
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £37.86k £1.38m £325.24k £507.35k £93.53k
Total expenditure £59.96k £1.29m £380.72k £302.48k £423.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £1.34m N/A £478.01k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A £12.88k N/A £18.21k N/A
Income - Other N/A £26.42k N/A £11.13k N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £1.29m N/A £299.73k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £3.67k N/A £2.75k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £4.55k N/A £2.52k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £3.67k N/A £2.75k N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 19 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 19 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 27 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 28 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 21 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Society of Authors
24 Bedford Row
LONDON
WC1R 4EH
Phone:
02038802230
Website:

www2.societyofauthors.org