THE GWILLIAM AND WOODWARD CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We supply small grants to residents of Clevedon for educational use for young people between 16 years of age and 25.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- North Somerset
Governance
- 27 June 1979: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Blake | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
DAVID EGGLESTON | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
HELEN MARGARET LONG | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Beverley Harris | Trustee | 05 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Hilary Schneider | Trustee | 15 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Robinson | Trustee | 23 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.68k | £1.08k | £1.25k | £1.43k | £2.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.20k | £100 | £1.07k | £1.55k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 27TH JUNE 1979
Charitable objects
(1) TO ASSIST PERSONS WHO HAVE NOT ATTAINED THE AGE OF 25 YEARS, WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF CLEVEDON, WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND WHO ARE PREPARING FOR, ENTERING UPON, OR ENGAGED IN ANY PROFESSION, TRADE, OCCUPATION OR SERVICE BY PROVIDING THEM WITH OUTFITS, OR BY PAYING FEES, TRAVELLING OR MAINTENANCE EXPENSES, OR BY SUCH OTHER MEANS FOR THEIR ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE OR TO ANABLE THEM TO EARN THEIR LIVING AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT. 2. IN OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING OF SUCH PERSONS).
Area of benefit
PARISH OF CLEVEDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 FAIRLEIGH ROAD
CLEVEDON
BS21 7XA
- Phone:
- 01275794108
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window