LORD LEVERHULME'S CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 212431
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Priority is given to applications from Cheshire, Merseyside and South Lancashire and the charities supported by the settlor in his lifetime. Other charities who do not meet those criteria should not appy without prior invitation but should, on a single sheet, state briefly their aims and apply fully only on being asked to do so.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Bolton
  • Cheshire East
  • Cheshire West & Chester
  • Knowsley
  • Liverpool City
  • Sefton
  • St Helens
  • Wirral

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 November 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rivington Trustees Ltd Trustee 25 October 2024
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £695.47k £587.11k £861.36k £935.82k £1.09m
Total expenditure £1.32m £437.05k £494.11k £678.95k £1.22m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £695.47k £587.11k £861.36k £935.82k £1.09m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.18m £305.34k £360.43k £545.90k £1.08m
Expenditure - Raising funds £138.60k £131.71k £133.68k £133.04k £133.23k
Expenditure - Governance £5.93k £6.42k £7.87k £7.63k £7.94k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.16m £287.41k £341.05k £525.22k £1.06m
Expenditure - Investment management £138.60k £131.71k £133.68k £133.04k £133.23k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Own use assets £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Long-term investments £34.50m £42.36m £42.99m £42.15m £44.81m
Other assets £172.21k £100.85k £312.16k £411.86k £262.89k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £1.43m £1.03m £564.92k £324.65k £568.74k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 23 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 23 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 19 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 19 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 22 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 22 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 12 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 12 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 17 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 17 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
LEVERHULME ESTATES
HESKETH GRANGE
MANOR ROAD
THORNTON HOUGH
WIRRAL
CH63 1JD
Phone:
01513364828
Website:

No information available