Financial history AMPNEY CRUCIS PARISH HALL

Charity Number: 212434
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £12.61k £5.52k £7.63k £34.57k £18.39k
Total expenditure £5.27k £12.99k £5.60k £9.36k £39.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A £12.50k £2.00k