Accounts and annual returns BASILDON CITIZENS' ADVICE BUREAU

Charity number: 212441
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 25 September 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 03 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 03 November 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 18 August 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 18 August 2004 On Time