BASILDON CITIZENS' ADVICE BUREAU
Charity number: 212441
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2006
Total income: £336,766
Total expenditure: £347,774
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
- The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
- Essex
Governance
Registration history:
- 20 December 1967: Standard registration
- 24 November 2006: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 24 November 2006: Funds transferred to 1113231 Citizens Advice Braintree & South Essex Limited
Organisation type:
Other names:
- BASILDON URBAN DISTRICT CITIZENS' ADVICE BUREAU (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £329.60k | £297.85k | £336.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £322.46k | £303.17k | £347.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 25 September 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 03 November 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 03 November 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 18 August 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 18 August 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3RD SEPTEMBER 1962 & AMENDED 16TH JULY 2001
Charitable objects
CITIZENS' ADVICE BUREAU SERVICES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE AREA DEFINED.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
URBAN DISTRICT OF BASILDON
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window