Financial history THE NATIONAL BENEVOLENT CHARITY

Charity Number: 212450
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.04m £1.31m £996.75k £1.43m £867.74k
Total expenditure £872.97k £157.36k £604.38k £987.92k £1.11m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £203.62k £176.47k £50.84k £255.52k £18.22k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £282.49k £264.48k £100.32k £72.05k £76.47k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £11.84k £0 £0
Income - Investment £548.82k £868.59k £705.84k £1.10m £768.05k
Income - Other £6.21k £4.00k £139.76k £5.81k £5.00k
Income - Legacies £200.00k £150.00k £39.00k £0 £12.73k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £782.13k £73.99k £497.80k £875.68k £999.05k
Expenditure - Raising funds £90.84k £83.38k £106.59k £112.24k £109.22k
Expenditure - Governance £68.74k £30.69k £25.26k £60.26k £6.17k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £343.42k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £76.71k £75.56k £99.68k £108.03k £104.95k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0