Governing document THE NATIONAL BENEVOLENT CHARITY

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 05/11/1859 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 17/03/1948 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 12/02/1997 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 19/07/2005 AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 14/12/2011 AND BYE LAWS DATED25/05/1955 AS AMENDED 01/07/1955, 15/01/1960, 11/06/1986 AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 16 FEB 2022
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF QUALIFYING PERSONS (AS DEFINED IN CLAUSE 4) WHO ARE IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE BY REASON OF OLD AGE, INFIRMITY, SICKNESS OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.