FORNHAM ALL SAINTS CEMETERY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of burial facilities for inhabitants of Fornham All saints ancient parish
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Suffolk
Governance
- 08 December 1962: Standard registration
- BURIAL GROUND (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER NORMAN HURRELL | Chair | 01 January 1999 |
|
|
||||
Rev Andrew Miller | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Kyra Turner | Trustee | 04 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN COLLINS | Trustee | 21 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
PETER GEORGE ELMES | Trustee | 01 January 1999 |
|
|
||||
MR CHARLIE BROWNE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.16k | £13.18k | £9.48k | £11.12k | £12.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.33k | £1.91k | £1.52k | £1.46k | £2.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 13TH SEPTEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
BURIAL GROUND FOR PARISHIONERS.
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF FORNHAM ALL SAINTS AS CONSTITUTED ON 1ST NOVEMBER 1899
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 RECTORY MEADOW
FORNHAM ALL SAINTS
BURY ST. EDMUNDS
IP28 6JR
- Phone:
- 01284705029
- Email:
- peterelmes@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window