BROMLEY SCOPE FOR PEOPLE WITH CEREBRAL PALSY

Charity number: 212514
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To promote the welfare,interests and advancement of our members who suffer with Cerebral Palsy and other related disorders.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2010

Total income: £7,089
Total expenditure: £422,702

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Bromley
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 November 1962: Standard registration
  • 08 July 1993: Removed
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BROMLEY SPASTICS SOCIETY (Previous name)
  • BROMLEY SPASTICS SOCIETY (FORMERLY BROMLEY AND WEST KENT SPASTICS SOCIETY) (Previous name)
  • WEST KENT SPASTICS SOCIETY INCORPORATING BROMLEY AND DISTRICT SPASTICS GROUP (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2006 05/04/2007 05/04/2008 05/04/2009 30/09/2010
Total gross income £16.02k £17.77k £238.82k £25.22k £7.09k
Total expenditure £11.52k £14.70k £36.55k £35.34k £422.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2010 11 April 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2010 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2009 26 November 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2009 16 November 2009 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2008 28 December 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2008 28 October 2008 On Time

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 SEPTEMBER 1962 AS AMENDED 10 JULY 1974 AND 23 OCTOBER 1985
Charitable objects
A FUND RAISING COMMITTEE FOR THE PARENT SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
BROMLEY AND DISTRICT
Registration history
  • 12 November 1962 : Standard registration
  • 08 July 1993 : Removed