THE PALESTINE EXPLORATION FUND

Charity number: 212538
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Learned Society for the study of the archaeology, history, geography, natural history of the Levant. -Publish journal PEQ; -Publish Research volumes; -Hold regular free lectures, exhibitions, seminars, conferences and courses at the premises and other venues -Give annual research grants; -hold research collections and literacy accessible to members -provide training for student volunteers

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £202,548
Total expenditure: £228,314

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Greenwich

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 December 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Louise Anne Martin Trustee 13 June 2024
None on record
Professor Joan Elizabeth Taylor Trustee 13 June 2024
None on record
Nicola Joan Margaret Elvin Trustee 03 July 2023
None on record
Richard Alan Rizzo Hills Trustee 03 July 2023
None on record
Ray Bruce Trustee 27 June 2022
None on record
Dr Daniel Kenneth Reynolds Trustee 27 June 2022
THE SOCIETY FOR THE PROMOTION OF BYZANTINE STUDIES
Received: On time
Dr Charlotte Whiting Trustee 27 June 2022
None on record
Amy Elizabeth Hitchcock Trustee 27 June 2022
None on record
Prof. Jennifer Anne Baird Trustee 14 June 2021
None on record
John William Ritzema Trustee 30 June 2020
None on record
Dr Zeina Khouri Klink Trustee 30 June 2020
None on record
Stephen Derek Sutton Trustee 03 December 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £209.16k £268.67k £244.57k £205.51k £202.55k
Total expenditure £221.11k £210.63k £202.94k £226.54k £228.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £3.00k £41.06k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 19 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 19 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 20 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 20 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 03 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 November 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

03 November 2021 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
5-6 Dreadnought Walk
Greenwich
London
SE10 9FP
Phone:
+44207 935 5379