Governing document BT BENEVOLENT FUND

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 10 NOV 1981 AS AMENDED ON 16 JUL 1987 AS AMENDED ON 08 JUL 1988 AS AMENDED ON 20 APR 1989 AS AMENDED ON 26 JUL 1990 AS AMENDED ON 09 JUL 1992 AS AMENDED ON 03 JUL 1996 AS AMENDED ON 13 JUN 2005 AS AMENDED ON 30 JUL 2014
Charitable objects
TO THE RELIEF (BY WAY OF A GIFT, LOAN OR IN SUCH MANNER AS THE COMMITTEE MAY DECIDE) OF CASES OF DISTRESS CAUSED BY:- (1) THE DECEASE OF PRESENT OR PAST MEMBERS OF THE STAFF OF BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS AND/OR BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS PLC OR PAST MEMBERS OF THE CLERICAL OR TECHNICAL STAFF OF THE POSTMASTER GENERAL OR OF PRESENT AND PAST MEMBERS OF THE BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS STAFF SUPERANNUATION SCHEME OR THE BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS PLC NEW PENSION SCHEME OR OF PAST MEMBERS OF THE CLERICAL OR TECHNICAL STAFF OF THE POST OFFICE WHO WERE SUBSCRIBERS TO THE FUND ON 31ST OCTOBER 1986. (2) THE RETIREMENT OF ANY PERSONS MENTIONED IN (1) ABOVE FROM THE SERVICE OF BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS, BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS PLC, THE POST OFFICE, THE DEPARTMENT OF THE POSTMASTER GENERAL, THE MINISTRY OF POST AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS, THE DEPARTMENT OF NATIONAL SAVINGS OR ANY GOVERNMENT DEPARTMENT TO WHICH SUCH PERSONS SHALL HAVE BEEN TRANSFERRED AFTER SERVICE IN THE SAID MINISTRY OR THE SAID DEPARTMENT (3) THE REDUCTION OF PAY OF ANY PERSONS MENTIONED IN (1) ABOVE OWING TO PROLONGED SICK LEAVE WHILE THEY ARE SERVING WITH BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS PLC, THE POST OFFICE, THE DEPARTMENT OF NATIONAL SAVINGS OR ANY GOVERNMENT DEPARTMENTS TO WHICH SUCH PERSONS SHALL HAVE BEEN TRANSFERRED AFTER SERVICE IN THE SAID DEPARTMENT OR IN THE MINISTRY OF POSTS AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS. (4) OTHER CIRCUMSTANCES ADVERSELY AFFECTING SUCH PERSONS OR THEIR DEPENDANTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.