THE WING HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision and maintainance of the village hall for the use and benefit of the residents of the parish of Wing
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 12 December 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gregory Lloyd Wakefield | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Arthur Malcolm Jones | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roger Michael Carey | Trustee | 14 August 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.22k | £83.55k | £79.12k | £80.33k | £76.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.29k | £68.92k | £64.44k | £73.22k | £78.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £19.10k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 13 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 13 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 12 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 12 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 16 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 16 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 12 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 12 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7TH FEBRUARY 1906
Charitable objects
PARISH HALL FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF THE PARISH OF WING.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WING
Contact information
- Address:
-
49 LEIGHTON ROAD
WING
LEIGHTON BUZZARD
LU7 0NW
- Phone:
- 01296682795
- Email:
- sjlambert49@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window