CHIGWELL RIDING TRUST FOR SPECIAL NEEDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of horse and pony riding to people with special needs
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Barking And Dagenham
- Essex
- Redbridge
Governance
- 05 May 1963: Standard registration
- PONY RIDING FOR THE DISABLED TRUST (Previous name)
- PONY RIDING TRUST FOR THE DISABLED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fran Maskell | Chair | 24 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sally Ann Crone | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Jane Padfield | Trustee | 18 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Richard Pohl | Trustee | 08 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Lingfield | Trustee | 15 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WOODCOCK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr JOANNA ELIZABETH THOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £291.90k | £218.26k | £372.88k | £245.47k | £240.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £292.06k | £285.44k | £322.30k | £335.12k | £344.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF COMMISSIONERS DATED 29TH JANUARY 1993 AS AMENDED 9 FEBRUARY 2000
Charitable objects
(1) THE RELIEF OF DISABLED AND INFIRM PERSONS (WITH THE APPROVAL OF CONSENT OF THEIR MEDICAL ADVISERS) BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR HORSE AND PONY RIDING AND DRIVING INTENED TO PROMOTE THEIR MENTAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING AND RECREATION AND MORE ESPECIALLY THEIR MENTAL AND PHYSICAL REHABILITATION AND WELL-BEING; (2) THE ENCOURAGEMENT AND ASSISTANCE OF RESEARCH INTO THE EFFECTS OF HORSE AND PONY RIDING FOR THE PURPOSES AFORESAID.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chigwell Riding Trust
Grange Farm Lane
CHIGWELL
Essex
IG7 6FB
- Phone:
- 02085006051
- Email:
- ken@chigride.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window