LAYER DE LA HAYE QUEEN ELIZABETH HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
provision of social, educational and recreational facilities.A meeting place for those living in the village and venue for public bodies to interchange views with villagers
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 18 January 1963: Standard registration
- VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Phillip Moore | Chair | 18 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK CORPS | Trustee | 18 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard Larkins | Trustee | 19 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
CAROLE LITTLEWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.98k | £20.35k | £25.40k | £28.10k | £28.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.61k | £25.23k | £27.52k | £29.11k | £29.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 March 2024 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 March 2024 | 41 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 13TH OCTOBER 1978
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF LAYER DE LA HAYE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURETIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF SCHEME).
Area of benefit
PARISH F LAYER DE LA HAYE
Contact information
- Address:
-
61A Malting Green Road
Layer-De-La-Haye
COLCHESTER
CO2 0JJ
- Phone:
- 01206734796
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window