THE GUILD OF PASTORAL PSYCHOLOGY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Guild of Pastoral Psychology offers a rich, dynamic forum for those interested, professionally or otherwise, in understanding the relationship between religion, spirituality and depth psychology, with particular reference to the work and writings of Dr. C. G. Jung.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 10 April 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adrian Scott | Chair | 25 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sarah Louise Taylor | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sonia Ouertani | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lynne Radomsky | Trustee | 25 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Paul Anthony Newman | Trustee | 25 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Leslie Ellis Oglesby Revd Canon | Trustee | 21 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carol Gay Adkins | Trustee | 07 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
TOBY SIMS | Trustee | 12 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
MR JIM KEELING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DOMINQUE KEELING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.97k | £19.39k | £19.06k | £36.73k | £81.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.37k | £38.16k | £44.48k | £52.98k | £60.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 November 2020 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 11 November 2020 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION 1947 AMENDED ON 1 MARCH 2001 AND 5 DECEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN DEPTH PSYCHOLOGY AND ITS RELATIONSHIP TO RELIGION AND SPIRITUALITY, IN PARTICULAR IN RELATION TO THE DISCOVERIES DERIVING FROM THE WORK OF C G JUNG
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ASL CONSULTANCY
23 Southway
BURGESS HILL
RH15 9SY
- Phone:
- 07545 616 722
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window